Moses v. Church & Dwight Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elvon Moses
Defendant: Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Focus Workforce Management, Inc. and Scotty Perkins
Case Number: 4:2021cv00820
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2022. Status Conference set for 6/29/2022 10:30 AM in via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2023 01:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2023 01:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 2/6/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on January 12, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 11, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #13 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC. AND SCOTTY PERKINS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendants Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Shreves, Darin)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORAL ORDER MAP Mediation set for 4/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. The parties are directed to review Judge Counts's Standing Order for MAP Mediations and Settlement Conferences located on the Court's website at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/counts and comply with its directives. Furthermore, the parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Mediation and Assessment Program section of the Court's website. The parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on January 11, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
January 10, 2022 Filing 29 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Elvon Moses. Reply suggestions due by 1/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Murphy, Phillip)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 joint motion for protective order as modified, including as to section 8 concerning challenges to a confidential designation. Signed on 1/7/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
January 6, 2022 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shreves, Darin)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 joint motion for extension of time to serve Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. The parties' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures are due by January 18, 2022, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed on 1/3/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for extension of time for Parties to Serve Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lewis, Meghan)
January 3, 2022 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #18 MOTION to remand filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendants Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. Reply suggestions due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Shreves, Darin)
January 1, 2022 Filing 23 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Church & Dwight Co., Inc.. (Shreves, Darin)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Defendant Focus Workforce Management's motion to dismiss (Doc. #16 ). Plaintiff's response is due by 1/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 12/31/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
December 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for extension of time , MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #16 MOTION to dismiss party , #17 Suggestions in Support of Motion filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Elvon Moses. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #16 , #17 ) (Murphy, Phillip)
December 29, 2021 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC. AND SCOTTY PERKINS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Elvon Moses. Reply suggestions due by 1/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Murphy, Phillip)
December 18, 2021 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION to remand filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Elvon Moses. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Murphy, Phillip)
December 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to remand filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Elvon Moses. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, Phillip)
December 16, 2021 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION to dismiss party Focus Workforce Managment, Inc. filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Lewis, Meghan)
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/30/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lewis, Meghan)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Church & Dwight Co., Inc. filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendant Church & Dwight Co., Inc..(Shreves, Darin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC. AND SCOTTY PERKINS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendants Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Shreves, Darin)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC. AND SCOTTY PERKINS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shreves, Darin)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #3 motion to dismiss case as to Defendants Church & Dwight Co., Inc., and Scotty Perkins, and #8 motion to dismiss Count IV against Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc., due to Plaintiff's filing #11 Amended Complaint. Signed on 12/3/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Elvon Moses.(Murphy, Phillip)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc. filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc..(Lewis, Meghan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION for order to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Defendant Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Lewis, Meghan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for order to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Meghan E. Lewis on behalf of Focus Workforce Management, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lewis, Meghan)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/19/2021. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/2/2022. Signed on November 19, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH THE CIRCUIT COURT OF CASS COUNTY, MISSOURI by Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins (Shreves, Darin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC.S AND SCOTTY PERKINSS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendants Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Service Letter)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Shreves, Darin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to dismiss case DEFENDANTS CHURCH & DWIGHT CO., INC.S AND SCOTTY PERKINSS MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Church & Dwight Co., Inc., Scotty Perkins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shreves, Darin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Darin Shreves on behalf of Defendant Church & Dwight Co., Inc..(Shreves, Darin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County, case number 21CA-CC00147, filed by Darin Shreves. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7679028. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complete State Court File, #2 Exhibit B- C&D (DE Corp.), #3 Exhibit C- C&D (NJ PPB), #4 Exhibit D- Focus Workforce (KS Corp.), #5 Exhibit E- Focus Workforce (KS PPB), #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shreves, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Church & Dwight Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvon Moses
Represented By: Phillip M. Murphy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church & Dwight Co., Inc.
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Stacy M Bunck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Workforce Management, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan E. Lewis
Represented By: Stephen M Strum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Perkins
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Stacy M Bunck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?