Walker v. AMCO Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gary Walker
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00824
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Parties' Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by AMCO Insurance Company (Richardson, William)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Defendant AMCO Insurance Company. (Beck, Douglas)
November 26, 2021 Filing 6 Affirmative Defenses & ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company.(Beck, Douglas)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/6/2022. Signed on 11/22/2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Douglas S. Beck on behalf of Defendant AMCO Insurance Company.(Beck, Douglas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action with the Circuit Court by AMCO Insurance Company (Beck, Douglas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV21840, filed by Douglas S. Beck. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7680781. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. AMCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Walker
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Goodwin
Represented By: Matthew Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: William Clark Richardson
Represented By: Douglas S. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?