1520 Swift LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 1520 Swift LLC
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00826
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1520 Swift LLC of Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Requests filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Plaintiff 1520 Swift LLC.(Molner, Mark)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Plaintiff 1520 Swift LLC.(Molner, Mark)
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 1/19/2022. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Mark Molner. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Anthony Kirkwood, Timothy Wolf. Time in court: 10:32 a.m. to 10:41 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company filed by Anthony Kirkwood on behalf of Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Kirkwood, Anthony)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Greg K. Winslett for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 17, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to allow Greg K. Winslett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7758850) filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Wolf, Timothy)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Wolf, Timothy)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony Kirkwood on behalf of Defendant Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Kirkwood, Anthony)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark D. Molner on behalf of Plaintiff 1520 Swift LLC.(Molner, Mark)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Anthony W. Kirkwood for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to allow Anthony W. Kirkwood to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7750950) filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Wolf, Timothy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by 1520 Swift LLC. (Molner, Mark)
December 1, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Wolf, Timothy)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/5/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 12/22/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 1/19/2022 10:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 11/29/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 21CY-CV09014, filed by Timothy J Wolf. Filing fee $402, receipt number CMOWDC-7683132. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Wolf, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1520 Swift LLC v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1520 Swift LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Molner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J Wolf
Represented By: Anthony Kirkwood
Represented By: Greg K. Winslett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?