Miley v. American Shaman Franchise System, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Miley
Defendant: American Shaman Franchise System, LLC, Shaman Botanicals, LLC, Leigh Geither and Stephen Vincent Sanders, II
Case Number: 4:2021cv00838
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Leigh Geither, Stephen Vincent Sanders, II, Shaman Botanicals, LLC. (Kern, Kendra)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to clarify filed by Rachel Catherine Rutter on behalf of Raymond Miley. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rutter, Rachel) Modified on 1/27/2022 to remove Motion to issue summons and attached summons forms. Counsel instructed on correct procedure to request issuance of summons and to submit completed summonses to kcgen@mow.uscourts.gov.(Woods, Gloria).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Caryn M. Groedel for Raymond Miley allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 Motion to allow Caryn M. Groedel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7761942) filed by Rachel Catherine Rutter on behalf of Raymond Miley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rutter, Rachel) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/19/2022) (Berner, Crystal).
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2022. Please see Order for additional deadlines. Signed on 1/19/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy) Pretrial Teleconference set for 6/2/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2023 09:00 AM (for 5 days) in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 1/19/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes.
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 1/19/2022. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Does Not Participate. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Stephen Moore. Time in court: 8:34 a.m. to 8:40 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 18, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Rachel Catherine Rutter on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Rutter, Rachel)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Rachel Catherine Rutter on behalf of Plaintiff Raymond Miley.(Rutter, Rachel)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Defendant American Shaman Franchise System, LLC.(Moore, Stephen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Hollis Hanover(Moore, Stephen)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. Change in TIME Only. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Teleconference is reset for 1/19/2022 08:30 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel shall use the participation information provided in #3 Rule 16 Notice.(Anderson, Christy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by American Shaman Franchise System, LLC. (Moore, Stephen)
December 8, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/5/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 12/22/2021. Scheduling Teleconference set for 1/19/2022 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 12/2/21 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Anderson, Christy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV17689, filed by Stephen J. Moore. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7694523. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Remainder of State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miley v. American Shaman Franchise System, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Miley
Represented By: Rachel Catherine Rutter
Represented By: Caryn M Groedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Shaman Franchise System, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaman Botanicals, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Geither
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Vincent Sanders, II
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Porto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?