Fleeman v. Charter Communications LLC
Plaintiff: Albert R Fleeman
Defendant: Charter Communications LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00857
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration. (Doc. #14.) The motion states that "Plaintiff consents to this request." Upon review, and for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED pending completion of the parties' arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report once every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 1/21/2022 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
January 21, 2022 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/8/2022 has been cancelled. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to stay Proceedings filed by Roy Nelson Williams, Jr on behalf of Charter Communications LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Roy)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Please note the new case number: 21-857-CV-W-SRB. (Melvin, Greg)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Charter Communications, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before. Signed on January 14, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Roy Nelson Williams, Jr on behalf of Charter Communications LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Roy)
December 30, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File its Responsive Pleading. Defendant Charter Communications, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before January 13, 2022. Signed on December 14, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time UNOPPOSED Motion to File Responsive Pleading filed by Roy Nelson Williams, Jr on behalf of Charter Communications LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/27/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Williams, Roy)
December 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal from state court by Charter Communications LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Williams, Roy)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 2/1/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 1/18/2022. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on December 8, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 8, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Amended Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action by Charter Communications LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Amended A)(Williams, Roy)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by Charter Communications LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Williams, Roy)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Removal of Action by Charter Communications LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Roy)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV23857, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7703522. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Williams, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleeman v. Charter Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert R Fleeman
Represented By: Stephen C Thornberry
Represented By: Randall W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications LLC
Represented By: Roy Nelson Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?