Taylor-Seals v. Independence School District
Plaintiff: Laurice Taylor-Seals
Defendant: Independence School District
Case Number: 4:2021cv00861
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ryan S VanFleet on behalf of Defendant Independence School District.(VanFleet, Ryan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of Plaintiff Laurice Taylor-Seals.(McDowell, Jessica)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 02:00 PM via telephone conference before District Judge Greg Kays. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2023 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 1/20/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Larry R. Rute(VanFleet, Ryan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint on behalf of Independence School District.(VanFleet, Ryan)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Damages against Independence School District filed by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of Laurice Taylor-Seals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McDowell, Jessica)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on or before January 21, 2022. Signed on 1/19/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONSOLIDATED SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT OF SAME filed by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of Laurice Taylor-Seals. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/25/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDowell, Jessica)
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laurice Taylor-Seals filed by Jessica Marie McDowell on behalf of Plaintiff Laurice Taylor-Seals.(McDowell, Jessica)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER /DISCOVERY PLAN by Laurice Taylor-Seals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDowell, Jessica)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Ryan S VanFleet on behalf of Independence School District. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(VanFleet, Ryan) Modified on 1/6/2022: The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. NEF regenerated.(Melvin, Greg)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Independence School District.(VanFleet, Ryan)
December 15, 2021 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/13/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/27/2022. Signed on 12/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV24516, filed by Jeffrey A. Marriott. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7706325. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Marriott, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor-Seals v. Independence School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurice Taylor-Seals
Represented By: Jessica Marie McDowell
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence School District
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Marriott
Represented By: Ryan S VanFleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?