Lam et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Plaintiff: Crystal Lam and Nina Phan
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00887
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01137.
December 15, 2021 Filing 27 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
November 3, 2021 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 9/2/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ; by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND SECOND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re Parties' #23 Stipulated Motion. T-Mobile's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended for a total of 60 days through December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 23 Second Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Kristine McAlister Brown filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re Parties' #17 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. The Court orders that the deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/18/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #15 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7248142 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein as related to C21-1119BJR. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam and Nina Phan, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kaiyi A Xie for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam and Nina Phan, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth Tran Plaintiffs Castillo for Crystal Lam, and Nina Phan, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam J Zapala for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam and Nina Phan, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Reid W. Gaa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223844 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kaiyi A. Xie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223835 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth T. Castillo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223829 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam J. Zapala FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223816 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) (Swope, Karin) Modified on 8/24/2021 Document filed in error using wrong event, struck at counsels request (JF). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7220133) Attorney Karin Bornstein Swope added to party Crystal Lam(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Bornstein Swope added to party Nina Phan(pty:pla), filed by Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swope, Karin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/24/2021 to replace malformed PDF) (MET). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lam et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Lam
Represented By: Adam J Zapala
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Kaiyi A Xie
Represented By: Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Phan
Represented By: Adam J Zapala
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Kaiyi A Xie
Represented By: Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?