Hughes v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Plaintiff: Franklin Hughes
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00889
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01139.
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JPML'S RULING ON TRANSFER re Parties' #14 Stipulated Motion. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7249206 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This action is reassigned to the Honorable Barbara Rothstein because it is related to Case No. 21-1119 BJR. This reassignment is ordered pursuant to this District's policy to transfer cases presenting common questions of fact or law to the judge to whom the earliest-filed case was assigned. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff Franklin Hughes. (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/30/2021. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7220191) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Franklin Hughes(pty:pla), filed by Franklin Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Hughes
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?