Huerta v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Plaintiff: Alexis Huerta
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00897
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01183.
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew George for Plaintiff Alexis Huerta, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence D King for Plaintiff Alexis Huerta, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew B. George FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Alexis Huerta (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7276745 (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence D. King FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Alexis Huerta (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7276732 (Terrell, Beth) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Parties' #9 Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7267429 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura (per related case C21-1119BJR). The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (GMR)[Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Alexis Huerta(pty:pla), filed by Alexis Huerta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Related cases, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth) (No Fee Required)(FEE PAID receipt no. AWAWDC-7231511) Modified on 8/31/2021 add receipt # (CDA). Modified on 9/1/2021 to edit document title. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huerta v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Huerta
Represented By: Laurence D King
Represented By: Matthew George
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?