Hamilton-Bynum v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Plaintiff: Sheila Hamilton-Bynum
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv00899
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01190.
December 15, 2021 Filing 31 MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings pending the JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
November 16, 2021 Filing 29 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings pending the JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name ; filed by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Lynch, Gary) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney MaryBeth V. Gibson for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel Kristine Tack for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Laird for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian C Gudmundson for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel K. Tack FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279957 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Laird FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279953 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Gudmundson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279951 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MaryBeth V. Gibson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7275487 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Colella for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary F Lynch for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas A. Colella FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7270767 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary F. Lynch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7270720 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Derik Ramon Campos and Stephen P Connor for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Parties' #12 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Attorney Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc, per #9 Notice of Appearance. (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Attorney Kathleen M O'Sullivan added for T-Mobile USA Inc, per #9 Notice of Appearance. (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7265018 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01208 2:21-cv-01226 2:21-cv-01245 2:21-cv-01250 2:21-cv-01266, by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Attachments: #1 List of Related Cases)(Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph P Guglielmo for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph P. Guglielmo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7258828 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 9/8/2021, filed by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 2, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7232473) Attorney Anne-Marie E Sargent added to party Sheila Hamilton-Bynum(pty:pla), filed by Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sargent, Anne-Marie) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton-Bynum v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hamilton-Bynum
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: MaryBeth V. Gibson
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Nicholas A Colella
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Derik Ramon Campos
Represented By: Stephen P Connor
Represented By: Anne-Marie E Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?