Green v. Midwest Genealogy Center
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Defendant: Midwest Genealogy Center
Case Number: 4:2021cv00932
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 1/10/22 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Copy of this order mailed to: Courtney Green, PO Box 5011, Kansas City, MO 64130.
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Courtney Green. (Woods, Gloria)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Courtney Green. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope)(Woods, Gloria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2022: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Midwest Genealogy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Genealogy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?