Green v. Kansas City Public Library
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Defendant: Kansas City Public Library
Case Number: 4:2021cv00933
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time for plaintiff to amend complaint in response to both defendant's motion to dismiss and their opposition to plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief filed by Courtney Green. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/4/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Submitted on 1/21/2022 via EDSS)(Houston, Kiambu)
January 21, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/21/2022 as Document No. 5, Motion for extension of time. The document has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 1/10/22 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Copy of this order mailed to: Courtney Green, PO Box 5011, Kansas City, MO 64130
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number is 4:21-CV-00933-FJG. Signed on January 3, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Chorny, Traci) Modified on 1/3/2022 **A copy of this order has been sent via first-class US Mail to Courtney Green, PO Box 5011, Kansas City, MO 64130. (Chorny, Traci).
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Courtney Green. (Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. A paper copy of the Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment was mailed to the Pro Se Plaintiff at the addresses provided on the complaint and civil cover sheet. Instructions were provided to complete and return promptly.(Woods, Gloria)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Courtney Green. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Kansas City Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?