O'Brien v. DST Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle O'Brien
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021mc09008
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE to motion re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Defendant DST Systems, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 3/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Robert T. Adams added to party DST Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adams, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Gary A. Fenner no longer assigned to case. Signed on 2/23/2021 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Crocker, Susan)
February 17, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Gary A. Fenner. Please note the new case number: 4:21-09008-MC-W-GAF. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Michelle O'Brien (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
February 17, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Filing fee $49, receipt number AMOWDC-7288188.(Schermerhorn, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. DST Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle O'Brien
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?