U.S. Department of Labor v. Compass Resources, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Defendant: Compass Resources, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2021mc09011
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 651
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez, Compass Resources, LLC, returned "unable to forward." (Related document(s) #3 ) (Cordell, Annette)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez, Compass Resources, LLC, returned "unable to forward." (Related document(s) #3 ) (Cordell, Annette)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE DIRECTED TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS. It ORDERED that Respondents shall serve upon Petitioner's counsel a written response to the Petition to Enforce Subpoena and Supporting Suggestions, specifically admitting or denying each allegation, and setting forth the cause, if any there be, why the Petition should not be granted, by April 30, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents named herein appear in Courtroom 7A in the United States Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri, at 10:00 a.m. on June 3, 2021, for a show cause hearing. Signed on 3/17/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular and certified US Mail on 3/17/21 to: 1)Robin Martinez, Registered Agent, Compass Resources LLC, 1150 Grand Blvd., Ste. 240, Kansas City, MO 64106 (cert mail receipt no. 7016 3560 0000 4920 1534) and 2) Tim Bowman, Managing Member, Compass Resources LLC, 6608 W. 200 Terrace, Bucyrus, KS 66013 (cert mail receipt no. 7016 3560 0000 4920 1541). (Cordell, Annette)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUGGESTIONS in support re #1 MOTION for order Enforce Administrative Subpoena filed by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Annastasia Tolley, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum Compass, #3 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 3 - 1-6-21 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 - 1-7-21 Email, #6 Exhibit 5 - 1-11-21 Email, #7 Exhibit 6 - 1-19-21 Email)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Hague, Dana)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for order Enforce Administrative Subpoena filed by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hague, Dana)
March 11, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. (Hague, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Department of Labor v. Compass Resources, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Dana Marie Hague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Resources, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?