Parrott v. DST Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rob Parrott
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021mc09012
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Rob Parrott against DST Systems, Inc. (Lock, Tania)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration Award. Doc. #1 . Signed on April 5, 2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Opalach, Tessa)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Rob Parrott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE to motion re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Defendant DST Systems, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 4/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Robert T. Adams added to party DST Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Adams, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Rob Parrott (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for order Confirming Arbitration Award filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schermerhorn, Andrew)
March 17, 2021 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATED by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Rob Parrott. See motion immediately following this entry for details. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. Filing fee $49, receipt number AMOWDC-7336509.(Schermerhorn, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrott v. DST Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DST Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Parrott
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Kenneth B. McClain
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: William L Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?