American Universal Insurance Company v. Reeder
Plaintiff: American Universal Insurance Company
Defendant: G. Wayne Reeder
Case Number: 4:2021mc09015
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 29 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #28 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Michael Philip Pappas on behalf of Plaintiff American Universal Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 6/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Pappas, Michael)
May 3, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Michael D. Doering on behalf of G. Wayne Reeder. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael D. Doering added to party G. Wayne Reeder(pty:dft))(Doering, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Second Subpoena by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Universal Insurance Company filed by Michael Philip Pappas on behalf of Plaintiff American Universal Insurance Company.(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Amanda Plotner by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Renee Aber by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Dennis Speer by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to CPIF Scarritt-Arcade, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to CPIF MRA, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to CPIF Lending, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Optima LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Optima, LLC)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to R.E. Loans by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Community First Bank by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to CPIF Catalina LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Great Western Bank by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to CPIF California, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Citizens Bank & Trust Company by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Stacy Reeder Robinson by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Leslie Reeder by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Desert Pools RV & Resort, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Sammy Jo Reeder by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to The View 2001, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to The View, LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Interstate Underground Warehouse LLC by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Interstate Underground Warehouse and Industrial Park, Inc. by American Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Pappas, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - Registration of Foreign Judgment filed by Michael Philip Pappas on behalf of American Universal Insurance Company. Filing fee $49, receipt number AMOWDC-7355817. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Abstract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pappas, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Universal Insurance Company v. Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Wayne Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul M. Hoffmann
Represented By: Michael Philip Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?