Acton v. Rahn
Plaintiff: Larry Thomas Acton
Defendant: Kaye Lynn Rahn
Case Number: 4:2022cv00281
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Larry Thomas Acton. (Kern, Kendra)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In FormaPauperis (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave through and including June 24, 2022, within which to renew his motion and file an amended affidavit of financial status. Signed on 6/1/2022 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa) Copy of Order mailed regular and certified mail to Larry Thomas Acton at 7732 Breckenridge Ave., Kansas City, MO 64139. Tracking info: 7020 1290 0000 1306 8340
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry Thomas Acton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acton v. Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Thomas Acton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Lynn Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?