Popson v. Mosher
Petitioner: Tomas C Popson
Respondent: Jason Mosher
Case Number: 4:2022cv00456
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward". Mail sent to Tomas Popson. (Related document(s) #2 , #5 , #6 ) (Willis, Kathy)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. (Willis, Kathy)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that this case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Any motion to reopen this case must be filed within a reasonable time and must be accompanied by Petitioners amended petition and updated address, as previously ordered. Signed on 8/26/2022 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Willis, Kathy)
August 18, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked "RETURN TO SENDER, ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD". Mail sent to Tomas Popson. (Related document(s) 3 ) (Cole, Robert)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Petitioner confirm or update his address on or before August 24, 2022, or this case will be dismissed without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed on 8/12/2022 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
August 11, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked "INMATE NO LONGER HERE". Mail sent to Tomas Popson. (Related document: new case acknowledgment letter) (Willis, Kathy)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that, because Petitioner has not filed his amended petition as directed in the Court's July 19, 2022, Order (Doc. #2 ), Petitioner shall SHOW CAUSE, on or before August 24, 2022, as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) due to Petitioner's failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Petitioner's failure to file a timely response will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 8/10/2022 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
July 20, 2022 RECEIPT number KCMO0996161 in the amount of $5.00 issued to FBO: Tomas C Popson. (Kern, Kendra)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Petitioner file a completed amended petition on or before August 9, 2022, that (a) identifies the conviction Petitioner is challenging; (b) identifies the claims Petitioner wishes to raise and facts in support of those claims; and (c) is executed by Petitioner. The amended petition must comply with Adams v. Armontrout, 897 F.2d 332 (8th Cir. 1990), in that the amended petition states "specific, particularized facts which entitle him [] to habeas corpus relief for each ground specified." Id. at 334. Petitioner's failure to timely file an amended petition as directed above may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner new habeas forms for his use in filing an amended petition. Signed on 7/19/2022 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Order with new habeas forms mailed to Petitioner as directed.)(Willis, Kathy)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tomas C Popson. (#1 Petition Attachments)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Popson v. Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tomas C Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?