Holt v. United Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tabitha Holt
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company and ZX International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00466
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/6/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2023. Status Conference set for 2/8/2023 10:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2023 11:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2023 11:30 AM, and Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on September 9, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 7, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company.(Jarrow, James)
September 7, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeffrey Joseph Burns on behalf of Plaintiff Tabitha Holt.(Burns, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2022 Filing 19 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Trial Order by Tabitha Holt. (Burns, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures by ZX International, Inc. (Pennington Ketchum, Amanda)
August 23, 2022 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company.(Jarrow, James)
August 19, 2022 Filing 16 Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company.(Jarrow, James)
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Joshua D Becker on behalf of Tabitha Holt (Attorney Joshua D Becker added to party Tabitha Holt(pty:pla))(Becker, Joshua)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to withdraw as attorneys. Attorneys John F. Wilcox, Jr., Amanda Pennington Ketchum, and Anne Lindner Saghir are terminated from representation of Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company. Signed on 8/12/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Amanda Pennington Ketchum on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Pennington Ketchum, Amanda)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 Affirmative Defenses & ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of ZX International, Inc..(Wilcox, John)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Michael W. Shunk on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company (Attorney Michael W. Shunk added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Shunk, Michael)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by James R. Jarrow on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company (Jarrow, James)
August 12, 2022 Filing 9 Separate ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand of Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney James R. Jarrow added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Jarrow, James)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. [1-2]). Defendants' answer or responsive pleading due 8/12/2022. Signed on 8/1/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Amanda Pennington Ketchum on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company, ZX International, Inc. (Attorney Amanda Pennington Ketchum added to party ZX International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pennington Ketchum, Amanda)
July 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Anne Lindner Saghir on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company, ZX International, Inc. (Attorney Anne Lindner Saghir added to party ZX International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Saghir, Anne)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Consent to Removal by ZX International, Inc. filed by John F. Wilcox, Jr on behalf of Defendant ZX International, Inc..(Wilcox, John)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to extend answer deadline to Plaintiff's Petition filed by John F. Wilcox, Jr on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company, ZX International, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney John F. Wilcox, Jr added to party ZX International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wilcox, John) Modified on 8/1/2022 to correct docket event per chambers' request (Crocker, Susan).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/24/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/7/2022. Signed on July 25, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2216-CV11477, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8029061. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Wilcox, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. United Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Holt
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Burns
Represented By: Joshua D Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda Pennington Ketchum
Represented By: Anne Lindner Saghir
Represented By: John F. Wilcox, Jr.
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Represented By: Michael W. Shunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZX International, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Pennington Ketchum
Represented By: Anne Lindner Saghir
Represented By: John F. Wilcox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?