Gilroy v. Cupples
Plaintiff: Terrie Gilroy
Defendant: Marilyn Cupples
Case Number: 4:2022cv00471
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Mediation set for 12/15/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. PLEASE NOTE: All those required to participate as set forth in the MAP General Order are required to participate in this mediation in-person, with the exception that Defendant Cupples herself may appear virtually and defense counsel shall effectuate Defendant Cupples' virtual appearance. Three-page, single spaced mediation statements in letter form are due via email to: lace_cline@mow.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 12/8/2022. Mediation statements shall identify: the nature of the dispute including the specific claims, defenses and available remedies; strengths and weaknesses; key players; prior negotiation history; and any lien or offset information. Mediation statements should also identify all participants, including their title, role, and company. (Cline, Lace)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (re: mediation setting) held on 9/13/2022. Counsel for parties appeared telephonically. Time in telephone conference: 1:30 p.m. to 1:45 p.m. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terrie Gilroy filed by Leah M. Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Terrie Gilroy.(Mason, Leah)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Leah M. Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Terrie Gilroy.(Mason, Leah)
August 18, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terrie Gilroy Opening Interrogatories and First Request for Production to Defendant filed by Leah M. Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Terrie Gilroy.(Mason, Leah)
August 18, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by John R. Weist on behalf of Defendant Marilyn Cupples.(Weist, John)
August 18, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terrie Gilroy Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Request for Admissions filed by Leah M. Mason on behalf of Plaintiff Terrie Gilroy.(Mason, Leah)
August 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference (re: mediation setting) set for 9/13/2022 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. **Parties have been provided the conference call-in numbers via email this date**(Baldwin, Joella)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2023. Telephone Conference set for 9/29/2023 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2023 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 8/10/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marilyn Cupples of Defendant's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff filed by John R. Weist on behalf of Defendant Marilyn Cupples.(Weist, John)
August 10, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY by Terrie Gilroy. (Mason, Leah)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Offer of Judgment by Marilyn Cupples (Weist, John)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Marilyn Cupples.(Weist, John)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/12/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 8/29/2022. Signed on 7/27/22 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2216-CV09641, filed by John R. Weist. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8032195. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex A - Petition 4-26-22, #3 Ex B - Affidavit of Service (6-27-22), #4 Ex C - Demand Letter)(Weist, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilroy v. Cupples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Gilroy
Represented By: Leah M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Cupples
Represented By: John R. Weist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?