Adams v. Penmark Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brad Adams
Defendant: Penmark Transportation, Inc., Antonio Spasov and Antonio Evgeniev Spasov
Case Number: 4:2022cv00514
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 joint motion for protective order. Stipulated protective order entered as modified. Signed on 9/20/2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Brown, Jonathan)
September 20, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/19/2022 as Document No. 16, Stipulated Protective Order. The proposed order has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
September 19, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Nicholas Zevenbergen on behalf of Brad Adams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/3/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER MAP Mediation Conference set for 11/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. The parties are directed to review Judge Counts's Standing Order for MAP Mediations and Settlement Conferences located on the Court's website at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/counts and comply with its directives (please note the Standing Order specifies deadlines for mediation statements). Furthermore, the parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Mediation and Assessment Program section of the Court's website. The parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on September 14, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brad Adams filed by Nicholas Zevenbergen on behalf of Plaintiff Brad Adams.(Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
September 8, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian Mena Israel on behalf of Defendants Penmark Transportation, Inc., Antonio Evgeniev Spasov.(Israel, Brian)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Penmark Transportation, Inc. filed by Brian Mena Israel on behalf of Defendant Penmark Transportation, Inc..(Israel, Brian)
September 2, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Nicholas Zevenbergen on behalf of Plaintiff Brad Adams.(Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Please note the new case number: 22-514-CV-W-RK. (Melvin, Greg)
August 30, 2022 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendants: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 9/12/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2023 01:00 PM Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. Jury Trial set to commence on 11/6/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. Trial is scheduled on 11/6/2023 through 11/9/2023, and 11/13/2023. See Order for all other deadlines. Signed on 8/29/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Cline, Lace)
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brad Adams. (Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brad Adams. (Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Zevenbergen, Nicholas)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Joint proposed scheduling order due by 9/7/2022. Rule 26(f) conference due by 8/24/2022. Signed on 8/10/2022 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Cline, Lace)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Service of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Penmark Transportation, Inc., Antonio Evgeniev Spasov re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Bowles, Byron)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Penmark Transportation, Inc., Antonio Spasov.(Bowles, Byron)
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2216-CV05168, filed by Byron A Bowles. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8051083. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowles, Byron)
August 8, 2022 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/29/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Penmark Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Adams
Represented By: Nicholas Zevenbergen
Represented By: Stephen Gilbert Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penmark Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Byron A Bowles
Represented By: Brian Mena Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Spasov
Represented By: Brian Mena Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Evgeniev Spasov
Represented By: Brian Mena Israel
Represented By: Byron A Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?