BAC Local Union 15 Welfare Fund et al v. A.K. Lee Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: BAC Local Union 15 Welfare Fund, BAC Local Union 15 Pension Fund, BAC Local Union 15 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, International Masonry Institute, Dustin Himes, Gregory S Davey, Caleb McCandless, James Boland, Matthew Aquiline and Michael Schmerbeck
Defendant: A.K. Lee Construction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00563
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A.K. Lee Construction, LLC. (Strodtman, Tracy) Modified on 10/20/2022 - A copy of this filing has been mailed to Defendant. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for default judgment Entry of Default by the Clerk of the Court filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION for default judgment by the Court filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of Plaintiffs Matthew Aquiline, BAC Local Union 15 Apprenticeship and Training Fund, BAC Local Union 15 Pension Fund, BAC Local Union 15 Welfare Fund, James Boland, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Gregory S Davey, Dustin Himes, International Masonry Institute, Caleb McCandless, Michael Schmerbeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Sollars, Bradley)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for default judgment by the Court filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sollars, Bradley)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. A.K. Lee Construction, LLC served on 9/13/2022, answer due 10/4/2022. (Sollars, Bradley)
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8087149. Service due by 11/29/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sollars, Bradley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/31/2022 to remove extra pages.) (Woods, Gloria).
August 31, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A.K. Lee Construction, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAC Local Union 15 Welfare Fund et al v. A.K. Lee Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Local Union 15 Welfare Fund
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Local Union 15 Pension Fund
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Local Union 15 Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Himes
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S Davey
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb McCandless
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Boland
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Aquiline
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schmerbeck
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. Lee Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?