Poluta v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Katherine Anne Poluta
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 4:2022cv00798
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Katherine Anne Poluta. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 12/13/2022, answer due 2/13/2023. (Bless, Jesse)
December 7, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jesse M. Bless for Katherine Anne Poluta allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to allow Jesse Bless to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 164836) filed by Rekha Sharma-Crawford on behalf of Katherine Anne Poluta. (Sharma-Crawford, Rekha)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief Under The APA against All Defendants filed by Rekha Sharma-Crawford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number 199796. Service due by 3/6/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-I-485 Denial, #3 Exhibit B-RFE Form I-485)(Sharma-Crawford, Rekha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poluta v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Anne Poluta
Represented By: Rekha Sharma-Crawford
Represented By: Jesse M Bless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?