Su v. WONP51, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julie A. Su
Defendant: WONP51, LLC, Pizza 51, LLC, Jason Pryor, Alan Kneeland, WONP51, LLC doing business as The Combine and Pizza 51, LLC doing business as Pizza 51
Case Number: 4:2023cv00698
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Greg Kays. Judge Morris no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 23-698-CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg)
November 6, 2023 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 11/27/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Julie A. Su. Waiver sent to Alan Kneeland on 9/29/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Sangha, Katharine)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Julie A. Su. Waiver sent to WONP51, LLC on 9/29/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Sangha, Katharine)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Julie A. Su. Waiver sent to Jason Pryor on 9/29/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Sangha, Katharine)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Julie A. Su. Waiver sent to Pizza 51, LLC on 9/29/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (Sangha, Katharine)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 2, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/23/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Katharine Sangha on behalf of Julie A. Su. Filing fee waived. Service due by 12/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sangha, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Su v. WONP51, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Su
Represented By: Katharine Sangha
Represented By: Ambriel Renn-Scanlan
Represented By: Evert H. Van Wijk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WONP51, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza 51, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kneeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WONP51, LLC doing business as The Combine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza 51, LLC doing business as Pizza 51
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?