Oguin v. Progress Software Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Oguin
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation, Arietis Health LLC, Anesthesia Consulting & Management, LP and NorthStar Anesthesia of Missouri, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00817
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, from Robert M. Farrell, Tiffaney D. Pete, transferring case to District of Massachusetts to be included in MDL No. 3083. Signed on 11/27/2023. Case electronically transferred. (Kern, Kendra)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Joyce Oguin. Waiver sent to Progress Software Corporation on 11/7/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Siegel, Norman)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Joyce Oguin. NorthStar Anesthesia of Missouri, LLC served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Siegel, Norman)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Joyce Oguin. Arietis Health LLC served on 11/9/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. (Siegel, Norman)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Joyce Oguin. Anesthesia Consulting & Management, LP served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Siegel, Norman)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 1:23-md-03083-ADP with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Woods, Gloria)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 7, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Norman Eli Siegel on behalf of Joyce Oguin. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8704750. Service due by 2/5/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oguin Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegel, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oguin v. Progress Software Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Oguin
Represented By: Norman Eli Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arietis Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Consulting & Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthStar Anesthesia of Missouri, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?