Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Gonzalez Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Virgil Kloth, Lance Claiborne and Brian Murphy
Defendant: Gonzalez Construction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv00128
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Re Local Rule 55.1 re #9 Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed on 4/26/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
April 12, 2024 Filing 9 RESCINDED PER ORDER #10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gonzalez Construction, LLC (Mitchell, Lisa) Modified on 4/26/2024 to rescind order (Mitchell, Lisa).
April 11, 2024 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Corrected Certificate of Service. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Harris, Melika) Modified on 4/12/2024: Document deleted as it was a duplicate filing of Doc. 6, with a corrected certificate of service. It replaced Doc. 6. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION for default judgment by the Court filed by Melika Harris on behalf of Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Lance Claiborne, Virgil Kloth, Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Harris, Melika)
April 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for default judgment by the Court filed by Melika Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Harris, Melika) Modified on 4/12/2024: Main document replaced, with corrected certificate of service. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
April 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for default judgment by the Clerk of the Court filed by Melika Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion for Entry of Default by Court Clerk, #2 Exhibit 1)(Harris, Melika)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed.Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2024. Signed on 3/28/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) Modified on 3/28/2024 to reflect copy of order mailed to Jose Gonzalez 19206 E. Ponca Drive Independence, MO 64056 (Woods, Gloria).
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Harris, Melika)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Melika Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8885114. Service due by 5/28/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, Melika)
February 27, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gonzalez Construction, LLC. (Crocker, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Gonzalez Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-America Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Kloth
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Claiborne
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Murphy
Represented By: Melika Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?