Vaught v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: John Vaught
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 4:2024cv00412
Filed: June 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann A Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1693 Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: having been notified of settlement of this case, the Court STAYS all deadlines. The Court directs Plaintiff to file, within 60 days, a notice of dismissal or, if required by Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared. If the settlement is not perfected within 60 days, Plaintiff must file a status report including an anticipated timeline. Signed on August 16, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 9, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
August 6, 2024 Filing 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER of the Parties by John Vaught. (Gosserand, Anthony)
August 6, 2024 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Gosserand, Anthony)
July 29, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Bank of America.(Broeker, Shaun)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer/responsive pleading. Defendant Bank of America's answer/responsive pleading due 7/29/2024. Signed on 7/8/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan)
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Shaun Craig Broeker on behalf of Bank of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/9/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Broeker, Shaun)
June 21, 2024 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/30/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/13/2024. Signed on June 20, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/21/2024). NEF Regenerated. (Grube, Cheyenne)
June 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 20, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shaun Craig Broeker on behalf of Defendant Bank of America.(Broeker, Shaun)
June 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Removal by Bank of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Broeker, Shaun)
June 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Shaun Craig Broeker on behalf of Bank of America (Broeker, Shaun)
June 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County, case number 24CA-CC00160, filed by Shaun Craig Broeker. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9066642. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Broeker, Shaun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaught v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vaught
Represented By: Anthony Landery Gosserand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Shaun Craig Broeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?