Hanson v. Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Hanson
Defendant: Jose Alfredo Martinez and Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00505
Filed: August 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by James C. Sanders, II on behalf of Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc. (Attorney James C. Sanders, II added to party Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Sanders, James)
September 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Patrick Murphy on behalf of Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc. (Murphy, Michael)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/21/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/4/2024. Signed on 9/18/24 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
September 17, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint on behalf of Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Attorney Michael Patrick Murphy added to party Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Murphy, Michael) Attachment removed on 9/18/2024 at request of attorney and will be refiled as Disclosure of Corporate Interests. NEF regenerated. (Grassano, William).
September 4, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Amber Hanson. Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Murphy, Amanda)
August 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Amended Complaint as a Matter of Course by Amber Hanson re #3 Amended Complaint (Murphy, Amanda)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Amanda Murphy on behalf of Amber Hanson.(Murphy, Amanda)
August 2, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc., Jose Alfredo Martinez filed by Amanda Murphy on behalf of Amber Hanson. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9132683. Service due by 10/31/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Amanda)
August 2, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc., Jose Alfredo Martinez. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hanson
Represented By: Amanda Murphy
Represented By: Shaun M Falvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Alfredo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowling Green Logistics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: James C. Sanders, II
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?