Smith v. Guadalupe Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brenda Smith
Defendant: Guadalupe Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00796
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jill A Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brenda Smith Production of Documents to Defendant filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Smith.(Hardinger, Heather) Modified on 2/4/2025 to correct docket text per filer's request (Crocker, Susan).
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 motion for protective order. See Order for details. Signed on 1/31/25 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
January 27, 2025 THIRD NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/18/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Discovery due by 11/7/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2026 01:30 PM Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. Five Day Jury Trial set for 5/18/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JAM) before Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2025. Signed on 1/24/25 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
January 23, 2025 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Smith.(Hardinger, Heather)
January 23, 2025 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 1/22/2025 as Document No. 10, Proposed Protective Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Crocker, Susan)
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Brenda Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/5/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Protective Order)(Hardinger, Heather)
January 22, 2025 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Third Party Map Mediator by Guadalupe Centers, Inc.. (Rottgers, Peter)
January 17, 2025 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by GCI and by Brenda Smith. (Hardinger, Heather)
January 10, 2025 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to sever MOTION to remand filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Smith. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Hardinger, Heather)
January 10, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to sever , MOTION to remand filed by Heather Jasmine Hardinger on behalf of Brenda Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/24/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hardinger, Heather)
January 3, 2025 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/24/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS CERTIFICATE filed by Peter Frederic Rottgers on behalf of Defendant Guadalupe Centers, Inc..(Rottgers, Peter)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Joint proposed scheduling order due by 1/17/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 1/8/2025. Signed on 12/20/24 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Guadalupe Centers, Inc..(Rottgers, Peter)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV31361, filed by Peter Frederic Rottgers. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9337575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rottgers, Peter)
December 12, 2024 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 1/2/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Guadalupe Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Frederic Rottgers
Represented By: Gregory P. Forney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Smith
Represented By: Heather Jasmine Hardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?