Kuriakose v. Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City
Plaintiff: Loni M Kuriakose
Defendant: Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City
Case Number: 4:2025cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the parties to file their JOINT stipulation of dismissal or Status Report by 4/21/2025. Signed on 2/20/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file response/reply Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/21/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/4/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 20, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, Unopposed filed by Sarah C. Liesen on behalf of Loni M Kuriakose. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/3/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Liesen, Sarah)
January 9, 2025 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF GREATER KANSAS CITYS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED PETITION filed by Rebecca S. Yocum on behalf of Defendant Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Yocum, Rebecca)
January 9, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rebecca S. Yocum on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Yocum, Rebecca)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/21/2025. Rule 26 conference due by 2/11/2025. Signed on 1/7/25 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
January 2, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 2, 2025 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Rebecca S. Yocum on behalf of Defendant Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City.(Yocum, Rebecca)
January 2, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV11840, filed by Rebecca S. Yocum. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9359987. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal (State))(Yocum, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuriakose v. Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Men's Christian Association of Greater Kansas City
Represented By: Brian N. Woolley
Represented By: Rebecca S. Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loni M Kuriakose
Represented By: Nico Stillwell
Represented By: Sarah C. Liesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?