Sciortino v. Ozark National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carrie Sciortino
Defendant: Ozark National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2025cv00029
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann A Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Bryan D. LeMoine on behalf of All Parties. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/18/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Attorney Bryan D. LeMoine added to party Carrie Sciortino(pty:pla))(LeMoine, Bryan) The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. NEF regenerated. (Grassano, William).
February 21, 2025 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/15/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2025. Status Conference set for 7/16/2025 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2026 02:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2026 02:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 6/15/2026 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Signed on February 20, 2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Zimmermann, Jaclyn)
February 18, 2025 Filing 7 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Carrie Sciortino. (Zimmermann, Jaclyn)
January 24, 2025 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 23, 2025 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Ozark National Life Insurance Company.(LeMoine, Bryan)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/20/2025. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/6/2025. Signed on January 21, 2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 16, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bryan D. LeMoine on behalf of Defendant Ozark National Life Insurance Company.(LeMoine, Bryan)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Ozark National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LeMoine, Bryan)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV25718, Filing fee $405, receipt number BMOWDC-9388191. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeMoine, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciortino v. Ozark National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Sciortino
Represented By: Jaclyn Zimmermann
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer R. Deschamp
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?