Williams v. Janco FS 3, LLC
Plaintiff: Silvester Williams
Defendant: Janco FS 3, LLC d/b/a Velociti Services
Case Number: 4:2025cv00030
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 motion to stay. Signed on March 11, 2025, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
March 6, 2025 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Casey P. Murray on behalf of Defendant Janco FS 3, LLC.(Murray, Casey)
March 5, 2025 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to stay Pending Arbitration filed by Casey P. Murray on behalf of Janco FS 3, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murray, Casey)
February 21, 2025 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 4/7/2025. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/21/2025. Signed on 2/19/25 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
February 17, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine Anne Davis on behalf of Janco FS 3, LLC (Attorney Katherine Anne Davis added to party Janco FS 3, LLC(pty:dft))(Davis, Katherine)
February 17, 2025 Filing 5 Janco FS 3, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Janco FS 3, LLC.(Attorney Casey P. Murray added to party Janco FS 3, LLC(pty:dft))(Murray, Casey)
February 6, 2025 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Silvester Williams. Janco FS 3, LLC served on 1/27/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (Paulus, Ryan)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL STANDING ORDER. All attorneys and unrepresented parties shall carefully study and comply with the ISO along with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Western District of Missouri's Local Rules (the Local Rules). Failure to comply with the ISO may result in the Court imposing sanctions, including but not limited to monetary payments, dismissal of claims or cases, entry of default judgment, or other appropriate sanctions. Signed on 1/24/25 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
January 22, 2025 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janco FS 3, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janco FS 3, LLC filed by Ryan Paulus on behalf of Silvester Williams. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9389089. Service due by 4/16/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulus, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Janco FS 3, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvester Williams
Represented By: Reid Jackson Parker
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janco FS 3, LLC d/b/a Velociti Services
Represented By: Katherine Anne Davis
Represented By: Casey P. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?