Henry et al v. Kelley et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv06125
Filed: October 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
Presiding Judge: Fernando J. Gaitan
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDERED setting Telephone Conference for 10/4/2011 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the status of this case. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to the Court at (816) 512-5630 after securing all the parties on the line. Defendant's Second MOTION in limine 205 , filed before the case was settled, is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed on 9/16/2011 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting plaintiff's 150 motion in limine and 155 plaintiff's motion to clarify. Signed on 9/23/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 defendant Russell's motion in limine and granting 100 defendant Russell's motion for leave to file answer out of time. Defendant shall file answer w/i 5 days of this order. Signed on 2/5/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry et al v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?