McDonald v. Char-Broil LLC et al
Plaintiff: McDonald and Megan McDonald
Defendant: Char-Broil LLC and Lowes Home Centers LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc., Cavagna North America, Inc. and Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino
Case Number: 5:2016cv06124
Filed: September 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
County: Platte
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Filing 90 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to all matters between the parties which were asserted in this case. Each party to bear its own costs. (Text Entry Only. No Document Attached.) (Enss, Rhonda)
June 30, 2017 Filing 89 STIPULATION of dismissal by Char-Broil LLC. (Stevens, Catherine)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re #87 Joint Status Report filed by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. Stipulation of Dismissal or Status Report regarding settlement progress due by 7/12/2017. Signed on 06/12/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo)
June 12, 2017 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Hoffman, Peter)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - This case was reported settled on 5/22/17. The parties are directed to file either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report discussing settlement progress on or before 6/12/2017. Signed on 5/23/17 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Enss, Rhonda)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Cancelling Telephone Conference previously set for 5/23/17. Signed on 5/23/17 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Enss, Rhonda)
May 17, 2017 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Hoffman, Peter)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Consent Protective ORDER (granting #81 motion for protective order). Signed on 5/16/17 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
May 12, 2017 Filing 81 Consent MOTION for protective order filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/26/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stevens, Catherine)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER setting teleconference to discuss #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts : Teleconference set for 5/23/2017 10:30 AM before District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan Jr. The parties will be notified via email of the Toll Free Conference number and the Access Code for teleconference participation. Signed on 05/11/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo)
May 10, 2017 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC of its First Amended Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and First Amended Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs First Request for Production filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendant Char-Broil LLC.(Stevens, Catherine)
May 10, 2017 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendants Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Stevens, Catherine)
May 4, 2017 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC of Third-Party Plaintiff Char-Broil LLC's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Third-Party Defendant Ferrellgas, L.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Char-Broil LLC.(Hoffman, Peter)
May 4, 2017 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC of Third-Party Plaintiff Char-Broil LLC's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Third-Party Defendant Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., and Grand Hall USA, Inc. filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Char-Broil LLC.(Hoffman, Peter)
May 4, 2017 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC of Third-Party Plaintiff Char-Broil, LLC's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Third-Party Defendant Cavagna North America, Inc. filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Char-Broil LLC.(Hoffman, Peter)
May 4, 2017 Filing 74 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff Megan McDonald. (Related document(s) #67 ) (Kennedy, Court)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts. Reply suggestions to Third-Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino's Response due by 5/4/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 04/26/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Powers, Jo)
April 25, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension to Time to Disclose Experts filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Megan McDonald. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/9/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kennedy, Court)
April 24, 2017 Filing 71 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendants Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. Reply suggestions due by 5/8/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #67 ) (Hoffman, Peter)
April 20, 2017 Filing 70 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts filed by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Cross Claimant Cavagna North America, Inc., Third Party Defendant Cavagna North America, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/4/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #67 ) (Sholtz, Philip)
April 20, 2017 Filing 69 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts filed by Steven F. Coronado on behalf of Third Party Defendants Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/4/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #67 ) (Coronado, Steven)
April 13, 2017 Filing 68 RESPONSE to motion to extend expert deadlines filed by Jordan Bradley Burns on behalf of Third Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Reply suggestions due by 4/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burns, Jordan)
April 8, 2017 Filing 67 First MOTION for extension of time to Disclose Experts filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/24/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kennedy, Court)
March 8, 2017 Filing 66 Amended NOTICE to take deposition of Megan McDonald filed by Jordan Bradley Burns on behalf of Third Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino.(Burns, Jordan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of change of address by Michael C. McMullen (McMullen, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of appearance by Jordan Bradley Burns on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (Attorney Jordan Bradley Burns added to party Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino(pty:3pd))(Burns, Jordan)
March 3, 2017 Filing 63 DESIGNATION of Lead Counsel by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. (McMullen, Michael)
March 3, 2017 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino filed by Michael C. McMullen on behalf of Third Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino.(McMullen, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (McMullen, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Filing 60 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Vincent F. Mike Igoe, Jr.(Hoffman, Peter)
February 13, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of filing Withdrawal of Deposition Notice by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (McMullen, Michael)
February 13, 2017 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Reply suggestions due by 2/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/13/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Watson, Olivette) Modified on 2/13/2017 (Houston, Kiambu).
February 13, 2017 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 2/13/2017 as Document No. 59, NOTICE of filing Withdrawal of Deposition. The document; previously modified to reflect as a Motion to Withdraw, has been modified to correctly reflect as a Notice of Filing. The deadlines (created on 2/13/2017) associated with the motion are hereby dissolved. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Frank J. Ciano for Cavagna North America, Inc.,Frank J. Ciano for Cavagna North America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed #ECF Registration Form to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106 This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri)
February 8, 2017 Filing 57 Motion to allow Frank Ciano to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5168458) filed by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc.. (Sholtz, Philip)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Thomas Scappaticci, Jr for Cavagna North America, Inc.,Thomas Scappaticci, Jr for Cavagna North America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed #ECF Registration Form to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106 This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri)
February 1, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of filing Notice of Deposition by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (McMullen, Michael)
January 31, 2017 Filing 54 Motion to allow Thomas Scappaticci to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-5156568) filed by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc.. (Sholtz, Philip)
January 31, 2017 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Third Party Defendant Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd..(Heigele, Christopher)
January 27, 2017 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan McDonald Plaintiff's Answer and Objections to Defendant Ferrellgas LP'S First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Megan McDonald filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff Megan McDonald.(Kennedy, Court)
January 25, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of change of address by Michael C. McMullen (McMullen, Michael)
January 20, 2017 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Megan McDonald filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff Megan McDonald.(Kennedy, Court)
January 17, 2017 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC Notice of Service filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendants Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Hoffman, Peter)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Michael P. Schaefer terminated as counsel for Third-Party Defendant Ferrellgas, L.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Attorney Michael C. McMullen remains as attorney of record for Third-Party Defendant Ferrellgas, L.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Signed on 1/12/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Powers, Jo)
January 11, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/25/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schaefer, Michael)
January 5, 2017 Filing 46 ANSWER to #43 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim (DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF CHAR-BROIL, LLCS ANSWER TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT CAVAGNA NORTH AMERICA, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM) on behalf of Char-Broil LLC.(Hoffman, Peter)
December 29, 2016 Filing 45 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Third Party Defendants Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc..(Heigele, Christopher)
December 29, 2016 Filing 44 AMENDED ANSWER to the Third-Party Complaint filed by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Third Party Defendants Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc.. (Heigele, Christopher)
December 23, 2016 Filing 43 Amended ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Char-Broil LLC on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc..(Sholtz, Philip)
December 22, 2016 Filing 42 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Rule 7.1 Disclosure filed by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Third Party Defendant Cavagna North America, Inc..(Sholtz, Philip)
December 19, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher L. Heigele on behalf of Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc. (Attorney Christopher L. Heigele added to party Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd.(pty:3pd), Attorney Christopher L. Heigele added to party Grand Hall USA, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Heigele, Christopher)
December 19, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint on behalf of Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc..(Coronado, Steven)
December 19, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of appearance by Steven F. Coronado on behalf of Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc. (Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd.(pty:3pd), Attorney Steven F. Coronado added to party Grand Hall USA, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Coronado, Steven)
December 14, 2016 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Vincent F. Mike Igoe, Jr.(Hoffman, Peter)
December 9, 2016 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino filed by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Third Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino.(Schaefer, Michael)
December 2, 2016 Filing 36 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc..(Sholtz, Philip)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 Defendant Cavagna North America, Inc's consent motion for leave to file a responsive pleading out of time. Defendant Cavagna North America, Inc. shall file its responsive pleading on ECF on or before December 6, 2016. Signed on 12/01/2016 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Powers, Jo)
December 1, 2016 Filing 34 RESPONSE to motion re #32 Consent MOTION for leave to file a Responsive Pleading Out of Time filed by James C. Clark, Jr on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Char-Broil LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/15/2016 unless service is made pursuant to FRCP 5 or as otherwise directed by the court. (Clark, James)
November 30, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of appearance by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (Schaefer, Michael)
November 30, 2016 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for leave to file a Responsive Pleading Out of Time filed by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/19/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sholtz, Philip)
November 30, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Philip Sholtz on behalf of Cavagna North America, Inc. (Attorney Philip Sholtz added to party Cavagna North America, Inc.(pty:3pd))(Sholtz, Philip)
November 28, 2016 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Third Party Defendant Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino.(Schaefer, Michael)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #9 motion to dismiss case. Signed on 11/21/2016 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Powers, Jo)
November 17, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to #13 Third Party Complaint on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino.(Schaefer, Michael)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 motion for extension of time. Third-Party Defendant Ferrelgas's initial disclosures are due November 28, 2016. Signed on 11/14/2016 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Powers, Jo)
November 11, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for extension of time to serve initial disclosures and memorandum in support filed by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/28/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schaefer, Michael)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Third-Party Defendant Ferrellgas, L.P.'s unopposed motion for extension of time until 11/17/16 to file a responsive pleading to the Third-Party Complaint of Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Char-Broil, LLC. Signed on 11/3/16 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Enss, Rhonda)
November 3, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael P. Schaefer on behalf of Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael P. Schaefer added to party Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino(pty:3pd))(Schaefer, Michael)
November 3, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION to dismiss case (DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION PURSUANT TO MO. REV. STAT. 537.762) filed by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Hoffman, Peter)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2017. Status Reports due by 5/17/ and by 6/30/2017. Trial to be set by future order. Signed on 11/1/2016 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
October 31, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff Megan McDonald.(Kennedy, Court)
October 26, 2016 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendants Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Stevens, Catherine)
October 25, 2016 Filing 19 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Report of the Parties' Planning Conference by Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Hoffman, Peter)
October 24, 2016 Filing 18 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Char-Broil LLC. Waiver sent to Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd. on 10/20/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (Stevens, Catherine)
October 24, 2016 Filing 17 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Char-Broil LLC. Waiver sent to Grand Hall USA, Inc. on 10/20/2016, answer due 12/19/2016. (Stevens, Catherine)
October 21, 2016 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Char-Broil LLC. Cavagna North America, Inc. served on 10/17/2016, answer due 11/7/2016. (Stevens, Catherine)
October 21, 2016 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Char-Broil LLC. Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino served on 10/13/2016, answer due 11/3/2016. (Hoffman, Peter) Modified on 10/21/2016 to correct docket text (Anderson, Christy).
October 17, 2016 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to dismiss case (DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION PURSUANT TO MO. REV. STAT. 537.762) filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff Megan McDonald. Reply suggestions due by 11/3/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) #9 ) (Kennedy, Court)
October 12, 2016 Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd., Grand Hall USA, Inc., Cavagna North America, Inc., Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Peter)
October 12, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Peter B. Hoffman on behalf of Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC (Attorney Peter B. Hoffman added to party Char-Broil LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter B. Hoffman added to party Lowes Home Centers LLC(pty:dft))(Hoffman, Peter)
October 12, 2016 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cavagna North America, Inc., Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino. (Watson, Olivette)
October 5, 2016 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/14/2016. Signed on 9/30/2016 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
September 28, 2016 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to dismiss case (DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION PURSUANT TO MO. REV. STAT. 537.762) filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendant Lowes Home Centers LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Stevens, Catherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2016: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit) (Anderson, Christy).
September 28, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss case (DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION PURSUANT TO MO. REV. STAT. 537.762) filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Lowes Home Centers LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2016 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Stevens, Catherine)
September 28, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Char-Broil LLC, Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Stevens, Catherine)
September 28, 2016 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendant Lowes Home Centers LLC.(Attorney Catherine A. Stevens added to party Lowes Home Centers LLC(pty:dft))(Stevens, Catherine)
September 28, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLC CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Lowes Home Centers LLC (Stevens, Catherine)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney James C. Clark for Char-Broil LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed #ECF Registration Form to 400 E. 9th Street, Kansas City, Missouri 64106 This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Anderson, Christy)
September 22, 2016 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Defendant Char-Broil LLC.(Stevens, Catherine)
September 21, 2016 Filing 3 Motion to allow James C. Clark, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-4996833) filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Char-Broil LLC. (Stevens, Catherine)
September 21, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Watson, Olivette)
September 21, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Platte County Circuit Court County, case number 16AE-CV02438, filed by Catherine A. Stevens on behalf of Char-Broil LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-4995669. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Char-Broil LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan McDonald
Represented By: Court T Kennedy
Represented By: Mark Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Char-Broil LLC
Represented By: James C. Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Peter B. Hoffman
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Represented By: Peter B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Grand Hall Enterprises Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven F. Coronado
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Grand Hall USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven F. Coronado
Represented By: Christopher L. Heigele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cavagna North America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank J. Ciano
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Represented By: Thomas Scappaticci, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ferrellgas, P.P. d/b/a Blue Rhino
Represented By: Jordan Bradley Burns
Represented By: Michael C. McMullen
Represented By: Michael P. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?