RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. et al v. Hospital Partners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, HMO Missouri, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., HMO Healthkeepers, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, BCBSM Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield and Regence BlueShield of Idaho
Defendant: Hospital Partners, Inc., Hospital Laboratory Partners, LLC, RAJ Enterprises of Central Florida, LLC, LifeBrite Laboratories, LLC, Empower H.I.S. LLC, David Byrns and Jorge Perez
Case Number: 5:2018cv06037
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 287 motion for leave to file Fourth Amended Complaint; granting 294 motion for leave to substitute. Signed on September 13, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER regarding discovery dispute concerning Rule 30(b)(6) depositions. Signed on August 30, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY ORDER to 255 . Signed on August 8, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 DISCOVERY ORDER regarding the dispute set forth in documents 234 , 237 , and 243 . Signed on July 22, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 DISCOVERY ORDER regarding the dispute set forth in documents 202 and 204 . Signed on May 10, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed on February 1, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying 77 motion to dismiss or for a more definite statement, and denying 124 motion to dismiss. Signed on January 23, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk) (Main Document 165 replaced on 1/23/2019) (Boesch, Nathaniel).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying 126 motion for entry of default; granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed on December 14, 2018, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc. et al v. Hospital Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross of California, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Healthkeepers, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueShield
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueShield of Idaho
Represented By: Timothy W Billion
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: Michael L Jente
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Nathaniel J Moore
Represented By: Neal F Perryman
Represented By: Randall Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Laboratory Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJ Enterprises of Central Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeBrite Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empower H.I.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Byrns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?