United States of America v. $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ladies yellow diamond pendant, 2015 Porsche Cayenne, VIN: WP1AC2A21FLA82799, $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC, $31,737.79 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx7325 in the name of Mets, LLC, $44,012.00 seized from U.S. Bank account no. xxxxxx8983 in the name of MLT Investments, LLC, Real property located at 8309 Forest Drive NW, Weatherby Lake, Missouri 64152, along with all its buildings, appurtenances, and improvements, $15,370.79 seized from Landmark National Bank account no. xxxx9754 in the name of First Avenue Leasing, LLC, 2015 Ford F-250, VIN: 1FT7W2BT4FED49948, Ladies diamond engagement ring in 18 karat rose gold and diamond eternity band, $11,216.82 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2259 in the names of Patrick Michael Dingle and Sarah Row, 2015 Porsche Macan, VIN: WP1AB2A56FLB70079, $127,828.05 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx6352 in the name of Onsite Construction Group, LLC ;, $60,311.44 seized from Vision Bank account no. xxxx3483 in the name of TDM Holdings, LLC, $1,000,000.00 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2022 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC, Ladies Rolex watch, Serial# S6412975, 2017 Toyota Tacoma, VIN: 5TFCZ5AN4HX091271, $218,313.97 seized from U.S. Bank account no. xxxxxxx7760 in the name of Matthew L. Torgeson, Ladies diamond stud earrings in 14 karat white gold with a total weight of 2.05 carat, $51,267.58 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2127 in the name of Haavig & Associates, L.L.C., $73,786.39 seized from Navy Federal Credit Union account no. xxxxx84863 in the name of Stephon Ziegler, Datejust II Rolex 41mm, serial# J8590886, Datejust Rolex, serial# 6T856340, $346,012.31 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx3271 in the name of Simcon Corp, $442,261.38 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2858 in the name of Onsite Construction Group, LLC, Ladies diamond tennis bracelet in 14 karat white gold, Gents Rolex watch, Serial # 2150X165, Ladies Tacori Royal T diamond eternity band in 18k rose gold, $550,000.00 seized from Community Bank account no. xxx6372 in the name of Torgeson Electric Company, Inc., $370,536.32 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx1454 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC, Ladies yellow diamond stud earrings and $22,321.33 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2424 in the names of Patrick Michael Dingle and Sarah Rowe
Claimant: First Avenue Leasing LLC, MLT Investments LLC, CoreFirst Bank and Trust, Matthew L Torgeson, Stephon Zeigler, TDM Holdings, LLC, Michael Dingle, Torgeson Electric Company, Inc. and Sarah Rowe
Case Number: 5:2018cv06112
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: St. Joseph Office
County: Platte
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING CASE, #47 . The Court grants the motion, and stays these proceedings until November 5, 2018. Per the parties' agreement, claimants shall file answers to the Complaint within ten days after the stay imposed by this Order is lifted. Signed on 9/10/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 9/10/2018 to reflect Order was signed on 9/7/2018. (Matthes Mitra, Renea).
September 6, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to stay Civil Forfeiture Action filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 29, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of appearance by Jennifer Marie Hannah on behalf of Torgeson Electric Company, Inc. (Attorney Jennifer Marie Hannah added to party Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.(pty:clm))(Hannah, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 45 CLAIM filed by MLT Investments LLC. filed by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of Claimant MLT Investments LLC. (Gaddy, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 44 CLAIM filed by Michael Dingle. Michael Dingle answer due 9/17/2018. on behalf of Claimant Michael Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Thomas M. Bradshaw added to party Michael Dingle(pty:clm))(Bradshaw, Thomas)
August 28, 2018 Filing 43 CLAIM filed by CoreFirst Bank and Trust. CoreFirst Bank and Trust answer due 9/17/2018. filed by Justin Marshall Nichols on behalf of Claimant CoreFirst Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nichols, Justin)
August 28, 2018 Filing 42 CLAIM filed by Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.. Torgeson Electric Company, Inc. answer due 9/17/2018. filed by Jean Paul Bradshaw, II on behalf of Claimant Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Verified Claim)(Bradshaw, Jean) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2018) (Crocker, Susan).
August 28, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of appearance by Jean Paul Bradshaw, II on behalf of $550,000.00 seized from Community Bank account no. xxx6372 in the name of Torgeson Electric Company, Inc. (Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw, II added to party $550,000.00 seized from Community Bank account no. xxx6372 in the name of Torgeson Electric Company, Inc. (pty:dft))(Bradshaw, Jean)
August 28, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of appearance by Justin Marshall Nichols on behalf of CoreFirst Bank and Trust (Attorney Justin Marshall Nichols added to party CoreFirst Bank and Trust(pty:clm))(Nichols, Justin)
August 28, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/27/18 as Document No. 34, NOTICE of filing. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed, document has been refiled in docket entry #36 . This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 28, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 8/27/18 as Document No. 33, NOTICE of appearance. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed, document has been refiled in docket entry #35 . This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 27, 2018 Filing 39 CLAIM filed by First Avenue Leasing LLC. First Avenue Leasing LLC answer due 9/17/2018. filed by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of Claimant First Avenue Leasing LLC. (Gaddy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 38 CLAIM filed by MLT Investments LLC. MLT Investments LLC answer due 9/17/2018. filed by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of Claimant MLT Investments LLC. (Gaddy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 37 CLAIM filed by Matthew L Torgeson. Matthew L Torgeson answer due 9/17/2018. filed by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of Claimant Matthew L Torgeson. (Gaddy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of filing Verified Claim of Interest by TDM Holdings, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Aisenbrey, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of appearance by John C. Aisenbrey on behalf of TDM Holdings, LLC (Attorney John C. Aisenbrey added to party TDM Holdings, LLC(pty:clm))(Aisenbrey, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of filing Verified Claim of Interest of TDM Holdings, LLC by $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Aisenbrey, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of appearance by John C. Aisenbrey on behalf of $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC (Attorney John C. Aisenbrey added to party $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC (pty:dft))(Aisenbrey, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 32 CLAIM filed by Sarah Rowe. Sarah Rowe answer due 9/17/2018. filed by Melanie Susan Morgan on behalf of Claimant Sarah Rowe. (Morgan, Melanie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Melanie Susan Morgan on behalf of Sarah Rowe (Attorney Melanie Susan Morgan added to party Sarah Rowe(pty:clm))(Morgan, Melanie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of appearance by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of Matthew L Torgeson (Attorney William Brian Gaddy added to party Matthew L Torgeson(pty:clm))(Gaddy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of appearance by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of MLT Investments LLC (Attorney William Brian Gaddy added to party MLT Investments LLC(pty:clm))(Gaddy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of appearance by William Brian Gaddy on behalf of First Avenue Leasing LLC (Attorney William Brian Gaddy added to party First Avenue Leasing LLC(pty:clm))(Gaddy, William)
August 21, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of filing by intrested party Monica and claimant by 2015 Porsche Macan, VIN: WP1AB2A56FLB70079 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit and claim of interested party monica haavig)(Osgood, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of filing of claim by interested party Monica Haavig by $51,267.58 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2127 in the name of Haavig & Associates, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit and claim of interested party monica haavig)(Osgood, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by John R. Osgood on behalf of 2015 Porsche Macan, VIN: WP1AB2A56FLB70079 (Attorney John R. Osgood added to party 2015 Porsche Macan, VIN: WP1AB2A56FLB70079(pty:dft))(Osgood, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by John R. Osgood on behalf of $51,267.58 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2127 in the name of Haavig & Associates, L.L.C. (Attorney John R. Osgood added to party $51,267.58 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2127 in the name of Haavig & Associates, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Osgood, John)
August 9, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Sarah Rowe by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Real property located at 8309 Forest Drive NW, Weatherby Lake, Missouri 64152, along with all its buildings, appurtenances, and improvements. Real property located at 8309 Forest Drive NW, Weatherby Lake, Missouri 64152, along with all its buildings, appurtenances, and improvements served on 7/27/18. Post and walk (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Stephon Zeigler. Stephon Zeigler served on 7/27/18. Personal Service (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to United States of America. United States of America served on 07/27/2018. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to United States of America. United States of America served on 07/27/2018. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Stephon A. Ziegler by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jordan Steinberg by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Torgeson Electric Company by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jordan Steinberg by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to US Bank by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Ally Bank by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to CoreFirst Bank and Trust by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Sarah Rowe by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jacob Baucom by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Monica Haavig by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Rustin Simon by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Torgeson Electric Company by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Matthew Torgeson by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Matthew McPherson by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of Complaint for Forfeiture to Michael Dingle by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (SEALED) against All Defendants filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee $400, receipt number 01. Service due by 10/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem - Redacted against All Defendants filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies yellow diamond pendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Porsche Cayenne, VIN: WP1AC2A21FLA82799
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $470,558.94 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxxx2121 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $31,737.79 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx7325 in the name of Mets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $44,012.00 seized from U.S. Bank account no. xxxxxx8983 in the name of MLT Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 8309 Forest Drive NW, Weatherby Lake, Missouri 64152, along with all its buildings, appurtenances, and improvements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,370.79 seized from Landmark National Bank account no. xxxx9754 in the name of First Avenue Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Ford F-250, VIN: 1FT7W2BT4FED49948
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies diamond engagement ring in 18 karat rose gold and diamond eternity band
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,216.82 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2259 in the names of Patrick Michael Dingle and Sarah Row
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Porsche Macan, VIN: WP1AB2A56FLB70079
Represented By: John R. Osgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $127,828.05 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx6352 in the name of Onsite Construction Group, LLC ;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $60,311.44 seized from Vision Bank account no. xxxx3483 in the name of TDM Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,000,000.00 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2022 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies Rolex watch, Serial# S6412975
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2017 Toyota Tacoma, VIN: 5TFCZ5AN4HX091271
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $218,313.97 seized from U.S. Bank account no. xxxxxxx7760 in the name of Matthew L. Torgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies diamond stud earrings in 14 karat white gold with a total weight of 2.05 carat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,267.58 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2127 in the name of Haavig & Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: John R. Osgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $73,786.39 seized from Navy Federal Credit Union account no. xxxxx84863 in the name of Stephon Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datejust II Rolex 41mm, serial# J8590886
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datejust Rolex, serial# 6T856340
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $346,012.31 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx3271 in the name of Simcon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $442,261.38 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2858 in the name of Onsite Construction Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies diamond tennis bracelet in 14 karat white gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gents Rolex watch, Serial # 2150X165
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies Tacori Royal T diamond eternity band in 18k rose gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $550,000.00 seized from Community Bank account no. xxx6372 in the name of Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $370,536.32 seized from CoreFirst Bank & Trust account no. xxx1454 in the name of Zieson Construction Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies yellow diamond stud earrings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,321.33 seized from Platte Valley Bank account no. xxx2424 in the names of Patrick Michael Dingle and Sarah Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: First Avenue Leasing LLC
Represented By: William Brian Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MLT Investments LLC
Represented By: William Brian Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: CoreFirst Bank and Trust
Represented By: Justin Marshall Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matthew L Torgeson
Represented By: William Brian Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephon Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: TDM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John C. Aisenbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Dingle
Represented By: Thomas M. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Torgeson Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sarah Rowe
Represented By: Melanie Susan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?