Szucs v. Lutz et al
Plaintiff: Margaret L. Szucs
Defendant: Bobby J. Lutz, Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC, Jeffery L. Lutz, Sandra A. Lutz and Larry L. Lutz
Interested Party: Louis Lutz, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv06135
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Separate Defendant Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC filed by Kenneth E Siemens on behalf of Defendant Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC.(Siemens, Kenneth)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Taylor on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Michael L. Taylor added to party Bobby J. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Taylor added to party Jeffery L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Taylor added to party Larry L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Taylor added to party Sandra A. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Taylor added to party Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Taylor, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Seth Slayden on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Seth Slayden added to party Bobby J. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Slayden added to party Jeffery L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Slayden added to party Larry L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Slayden added to party Sandra A. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Slayden added to party Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Slayden, Seth)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 IT IS ORDERED the parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleadings (Doc. #9) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their initial responsive pleadings on or before December 3, 2018. Signed on 10/3/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/5/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/29/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/28/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Kenneth E Siemens on behalf of Bobby J. Lutz, Jeffery L. Lutz, Larry L. Lutz, Sandra A. Lutz, Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Kenneth E Siemens added to party Bobby J. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth E Siemens added to party Jeffery L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth E Siemens added to party Larry L. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth E Siemens added to party Sandra A. Lutz(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth E Siemens added to party Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Siemens, Kenneth)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Bobby J. Lutz served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Sandra A. Lutz served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Jeffery L. Lutz served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Larry L. Lutz served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Margaret L. Szucs. Louis Lutz, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Bartels, Todd)
September 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis Lutz, Inc., Bobby J. Lutz, Jeffery L. Lutz, Larry L. Lutz, Sandra A. Lutz, Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis Lutz, Inc., Bobby J. Lutz, Jeffery L. Lutz, Larry L. Lutz, Sandra A. Lutz, Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC filed by Todd Henry Bartels on behalf of Margaret L. Szucs. Filing fee $400, receipt number MOWDC-5925611. Service due by 12/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bartels, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szucs v. Lutz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby J. Lutz
Represented By: Seth Slayden
Represented By: Kenneth E Siemens
Represented By: Michael L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutz Cattle Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Seth Slayden
Represented By: Kenneth E Siemens
Represented By: Michael L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery L. Lutz
Represented By: Seth Slayden
Represented By: Kenneth E Siemens
Represented By: Michael L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra A. Lutz
Represented By: Seth Slayden
Represented By: Kenneth E Siemens
Represented By: Michael L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L. Lutz
Represented By: Seth Slayden
Represented By: Kenneth E Siemens
Represented By: Michael L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Louis Lutz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret L. Szucs
Represented By: Todd Henry Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?