United States of America v. Zeno
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Antwaun D. Zeno
Case Number: 5:2019cv06029
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as unclaimed. Mail sent to Antwann Zeno. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Kern, Kendra)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Antwaun D. Zeno in the amount of $16,603.36. Copy of Judgment mailed with Order #5 . (Anderson, Christy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion for consent judgment against defendant Antwaun D. Zeno in the amount of $16,603.36. Signed on 5/8/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of Order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7016 3560 0000 4920 2210) to Antwann Zeno at 5832 NW Walnut Ct., Parkville, MO 64152-3236. (Anderson, Christy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for consent judgment filed by Matthew N. Sparks on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A: Stipulation to Enter Into Consent Judgment)(Sparks, Matthew)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Antwaun D. Zeno on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Sparks, Matthew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antwaun D. Zeno filed by Matthew N. Sparks on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 6/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sparks, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwaun D. Zeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew N. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?