Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc. v. Angel Hospitality, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel and Mike Patel
Case Number: 5:2019cv06046
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Before this Court is the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (Doc. #18). Accordingly, this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed on 6/13/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of dismissal With Prejudice by Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Permanent Injunction. Signed on 6/10/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for consent judgment JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gilman, Stacey)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (and Affirmative Defenses) on behalf of Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel.(Thoenen, Brad)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 Before this Court is Defendants Angel Hospitality, LLC's and Mahendra (Mike) Patel's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Compensatory Damages, Treble Damages, Injunctive Relief and Attorney's Fees. (Doc. #13). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendants are granted an extension of time until and including May 20, 2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed on 5/13/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Thoenen, Brad)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Defendant Angel Hospitality, LLC.(Thoenen, Brad)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Brad K. Thoenen on behalf of Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel (Attorney Brad K. Thoenen added to party Angel Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brad K. Thoenen added to party Mahendra Patel(pty:dft))(Thoenen, Brad)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven J Peretz for Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Steven I. Peretz to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6300825) filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Albert Alvarez for Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Plaintiff Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc..(Gilman, Stacey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. Mahendra Patel served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Gilman, Stacey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. Angel Hospitality, LLC served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Gilman, Stacey)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Albert Alvarez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6284681) filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel. (Woods, Gloria)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 3,216,237 and 4,330,925. Plaintiff(s): Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Stacey R. Gilman, Berkowitz Oliver LLP-KCMO, 2600 Grand Blvd., Suite 1200, Kansas City, MO 64108 Defendant(s): Angel Hospitality, LLC, Mahendra Patel (Mike Patel) The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 AO 120) (Woods, Gloria)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Compensatory Damages, Treble Damages, Injunctive Relief and Attorney's Fees against Angel Hospitality, LLC filed by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6265076. Service due by 7/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Gilman, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc. v. Angel Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Lion Hotels Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Albert Alvarez
Represented By: Steven J Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahendra Patel
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Patel
Represented By: Brad K. Thoenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?