Schafer v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Michael Schafer
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv06047
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ***Remark: The Court hereby acknowledges the parties Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc. #10) and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by BNSF Railway Company. (Winter, Pamela)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company filed by Pamela Jane Winter on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Winter, Pamela)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Celia K. Douglas on behalf of Michael Schafer (Attorney Celia K. Douglas added to party Michael Schafer(pty:pla))(Douglas, Celia)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/20/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 6/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 5/8/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Pamela Jane Winter on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Attorney Pamela Jane Winter added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Winter, Pamela)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Chad Michael Knight on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Knight, Chad)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of BNSF Railway Company.(Attorney Chad Michael Knight added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Knight, Chad)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michael Schafer. BNSF Railway Company served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Schlichter, Jerome)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNSF Railway Company. (Melvin, Greg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company filed by Jerome J. Schlichter on behalf of Michael Schafer. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6266802. Service due by 7/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schlichter, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schafer v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schafer
Represented By: Jerome J. Schlichter
Represented By: Nelson G Wolff
Represented By: Celia K. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Chad Michael Knight
Represented By: Pamela Jane Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?