T.S.H. et al v. Northwest Missouri State University et al
Plaintiff: M. J. and T. S. H.
Defendant: Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University and Anthony Williams
Case Number: 5:2019cv06059
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 10:2305
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response(s) by no later than July 12, 2019. Signed on 6/28/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, R.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of Defendants Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Raupp, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Raupp, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file their answer(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their answer(s) or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by no later than June 14, 2019. The parties' deadlines to hold their Rule 26 conference and filed their joint proposed scheduling order, as set forth in the Court's May 7, 2019 Order (Doc. #6), remain unchanged. Signed on 6/7/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #12 Amended Complaint filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Raupp, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot and denying without prejudice (Doc. #3) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim due to the filing of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. #12) on May 24, 2019. Signed on 5/28/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 24, 2019 Reset Deadline as to #3 Plaintiffs' suggestions in opposition/response to Defendants' motion to dismiss due by 5/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to file response(s) to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #3). Plaintiffs shall file their response(s) by no later than May 31, 2019. Signed on 5/24/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time (UNOPPOSED) filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Murphy, R.)
May 17, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #3). Plaintiffs shall file their response(s) by no later than May 24, 2019. Signed on 5/17/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time (UNOPPOSED) filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, R.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. (Raupp, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal by Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Notice to State Court and Plaintiffs of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Raupp, Michael)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 5/7/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 6/21/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/5/2019. Signed on 5/7/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of Defendants Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Raupp, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Raupp, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal by Clarence Green, Northwest Missouri State University, Anthony Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Filestamped Notice or Removal)(Raupp, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of Nodaway County, Missouri County, case number 19ND-CC00052, filed by Michael Thomas Raupp on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6297145. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raupp, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.S.H. et al v. Northwest Missouri State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. J.
Represented By: R. Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. S. H.
Represented By: R. Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Green
Represented By: Michael Thomas Raupp
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: Allen F. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Missouri State University
Represented By: Michael Thomas Raupp
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: Allen F. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Williams
Represented By: Michael Thomas Raupp
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: Allen F. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?