Lory v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sienna Victoria Lory
Defendant: Darrel Eugene Woods and Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv06112
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Donald L. O'Keefe on behalf of Defendant Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(O'Keefe, Donald)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 This case was selected for inclusion in the Court's Mediation and Assessment Program ("MAP"). (Doc. 3.) Pending before the Court is a Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Designate an Outside Mediator and Conduct Mediation. This Motion is DENIED, because it is inconsistent with the MAP General Order (see 3-1). As set out in section V, paragraph C of that Order, this request should be directed to the MAP Administrator. Signed on 10/23/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for extension of time for Designation of Outside Mediator and Mediation filed by James Albert Montee on behalf of Sienna Victoria Lory. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Montee, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James Albert Montee on behalf of Plaintiff Sienna Victoria Lory.(Montee, James)
October 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darrel Eugene Woods. (Ellis, Lindsey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sienna Victoria Lory Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production to Defendant Swift Transportation Company of Arizona filed by Amanda Montee on behalf of Plaintiff Sienna Victoria Lory.(Montee, Amanda)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2020. Teleconference set for 12/21/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2021 11:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 10/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Amanda Montee on behalf of Sienna Victoria Lory. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Montee, Amanda) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/11/2019) (Crocker, Susan). Modified on 10/15/2019: The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. (Melvin, Greg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Montee, Amanda)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC. (O'Keefe, Donald)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sienna Victoria Lory. (Montee, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(O'Keefe, Donald)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Donald L. O'Keefe on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC (O'Keefe, Donald)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 9/13/2019 as Document Nos. 6 and 7, Notice of Appearance, and Defendants' Answer. At the request of the filing party, the documents have been deleted as the incorrect documents were filed. Counsel will refile the correct documents. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Darrel Eugene Woods.(O'Keefe, Donald)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Donald L. O'Keefe on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC, Darrel Eugene Woods (Attorney Donald L. O'Keefe added to party Darrel Eugene Woods(pty:dft))(O'Keefe, Donald)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/28/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/15/2019. Signed on 9/11/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal by Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(O'Keefe, Donald)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Donald L. O'Keefe on behalf of Defendant Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC.(O'Keefe, Donald)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Andrew County Circuit Court County, case number 19AW-CC00197, filed by Donald L. O'Keefe on behalf of Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6479024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Keefe, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lory v. Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sienna Victoria Lory
Represented By: Amanda Montee
Represented By: James Albert Montee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Eugene Woods
Represented By: Donald L. O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?