Draper v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Russell Draper
Defendant: T K Bredeman, J. Cofield, Brenda Shira, Machelle Wallace, Agusta Amadi, Corizon LLC, Todd Richards, C Inzerillo, John Matthews, Frederick Covillo, Anne L. Precythe, Lacinda Taube, Missouri Department of Corrections, S Moeller and Martha Daily
Case Number: 5:2019cv06116
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Carrie L. Kinsella on behalf of T K Bredeman, J. Cofield, Corizon LLC, Frederick Covillo, C Inzerillo, S Moeller, Todd Richards, Lacinda Taube, Machelle Wallace (Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party T K Bredeman(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party J. Cofield(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party Corizon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party Frederick Covillo(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party C Inzerillo(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party S Moeller(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party Todd Richards(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party Lacinda Taube(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie L. Kinsella added to party Machelle Wallace(pty:dft))(Kinsella, Carrie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica L. Liss on behalf of T K Bredeman, J. Cofield, Corizon LLC, Frederick Covillo, C Inzerillo, S Moeller, Todd Richards, Lacinda Taube, Machelle Wallace (Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party T K Bredeman(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party J. Cofield(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Corizon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Frederick Covillo(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party C Inzerillo(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party S Moeller(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Todd Richards(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Lacinda Taube(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L. Liss added to party Machelle Wallace(pty:dft))(Liss, Jessica)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to order re #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, Entry of Appearance and Waiver of Service filed by Amber Lee Krisp on behalf of Defendants Missouri Department of Corrections, Anne L. Precythe. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Krisp, Amber)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Doc. #6 ) is granted; (2) the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the balance of the $350 filing fee is paid; (3) the Attorney General of Missouri and Corizon, Inc. notify the Court, in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, for which Defendants they will and will not waive service of process; and (4) Defendants answer or otherwise respond, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and 12, within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order if service of process is waived, or within twenty-one (21) days after service of process if service of process is not waived. Signed on September 30, 2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee filed by Russell Draper. (Willis, Kathy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $29.90; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before September 26, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on September 12, 2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Russell Draper. (Davies, Cindy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Russell Draper. (Davies, Cindy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Russell Draper. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T K Bredeman
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cofield
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Shira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machelle Wallace
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agusta Amadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Richards
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Inzerillo
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Covillo
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacinda Taube
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Moeller
Represented By: Carrie L. Kinsella
Represented By: Jessica L. Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?