Wiser v. Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karlie Wiser
Defendant: Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv06117
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2020. Status Conference set for 5/6/2020 10:30 AM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2020 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2021 11:30 AM; and Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on October 31, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Karlie Wiser. (Brown, Charles)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 This Order has been amended. Please refer to the First Amended Scheduling Order (Doc. #9 ). SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2020. Status Conference set for 3/11/2020 11:30 AM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 01:30 PM; and Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The parties may file a revised proposed scheduling order that complies with Local Rule 26.1(c)(2) within five days from the date of this Order if they wish to seek more than the provided time to complete discovery. Signed on October 22, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) Modified on 11/4/2019 (Wheeler, LaTandra).
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Karlie Wiser. (Brown, Charles)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc..(Boatright, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc..(Boatright, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/11/2019.Proposed scheduling order due by 10/25/2019. Signed on September 13, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County, case number 19CN-CC00051, filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6485508. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A state court complaint, #2 Exhibit B state court filings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boatright, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiser v. Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Favorite Healthcare Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlie Wiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?