B.P.S., LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: B.P.S., LLC
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv06154
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2020. Status reports due by 6/22/2020. Trial will be set by future order. Please see text of order for additional deadlines. Signed on 1/6/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service by B.P.S., LLC (Ehlert, R)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 11/12/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing of Removal by Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Brady, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Covington Specialty Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jonathan B. Morrow on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Brady, Robert) Modified on 11/12/2019 to correct name. (Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company (Brady, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buchanan County, case number 19BU-CV04474, filed by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Covington Specialty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6577032. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.P.S., LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.P.S., LLC
Represented By: R Todd Ehlert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Brady
Represented By: Jonathan B Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?