Gallatin v. Texas Roadhouse Management Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Gallatin
Defendant: Ryan Jones, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp. and Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv06167
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Brittany Gallatin. (Murphy, R.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Brittany Gallatin.(Murphy, R.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Alyssa M Sediqzad on behalf of Defendants Ryan Jones, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp..(Sediqzad, Alyssa)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to remand filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Brittany Gallatin. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Murphy, R.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Brittany Gallatin. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Murphy, R.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Brittany Gallatin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Murphy, R.)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants Ryan Jones, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.. Reply suggestions due by 2/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to remand filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Brittany Gallatin. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Murphy, R.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to remand filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Brittany Gallatin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Murphy, R.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION to dismiss party and dismiss plaintiff's claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress (Count IV) filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants Ryan Jones, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION to dismiss party and dismiss plaintiff's claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress (Count IV) filed by R. Edward Murphy on behalf of Plaintiff Brittany Gallatin. Reply suggestions due by 1/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Murphy, R.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/20/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 2/10/2020. Signed on 1/6/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp..(Boatright, Daniel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp..(Boatright, Daniel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUGGESTIONS in support re #2 MOTION to dismiss party and dismiss plaintiff's claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress (Count IV) filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants Ryan Jones, Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC, Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to dismiss party and dismiss plaintiff's claim for negligent infliction of emotional distress (Count IV) filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boatright, Daniel)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Buchanan County, case number 19BU-CV05095, filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6642623. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- service pleadings, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of L LeMaster, #3 Affidavit - Declaration of H Mann, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boatright, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallatin v. Texas Roadhouse Management Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Jones
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Alyssa M Sediqzad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Management Corp.
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Alyssa M Sediqzad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Roadhouse Holdings LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Alyssa M Sediqzad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Gallatin
Represented By: R. Edward Murphy
Represented By: Kyle Edward Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?