Rickey et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Rickey, Roxann Rickey and Daniel Rickey, Sr.
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. a/k/a The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Substitute Trustee Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, PHH Mortgage Services, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Novastar Financial, Inc., New Rez Mortgage Services, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 5:2020cv06031
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED: grants Plaintiffs an extension of time until and including April 30, 2020, to file their Suggestions in Opposition to Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. #3) and their Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant STC's pending Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Doc. #11). Signed on 4/10/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Modified on 4/13/2020 to note that a copy of the order was mailed out individually, via USPS to both Daniel Rickey, Sr. and Roxann Rickey to the following address: 708 South 20th Street Bethany, MO 64424. (Woods, Gloria).
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Daniel Rickey, Sr, Roxann Rickey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Houston, Kiambu)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Tillma, Matthew)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tillma, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER to motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Joinder of Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Nicol, Jonathon) Modified on 4/3/2020 to reflect as joinder and to remove reply suggestion deadline (Houston, Kiambu).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2020. Signed on 4/1/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Modified on 4/1/2020 to reflect copy of this Order has been mailed to Daniel and Roxann Rickey; 708 South 20th Street; Bethany, MO 64424 (Ellis, Lindsey).
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Before the Court is Defendant Substitute Trustee Corporation's Motion for Extension of 10 Days to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading to Complaint. (Doc. #7). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendant STC is granted an extension of time until and including April 10, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed on 3/23/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tillma, Matthew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corporation (Attorney Matthew Tillma added to party Substitute Trustee Corporation(pty:dft))(Tillma, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Services, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. of Notice of Inclusion in the Mediation and Assessment Program filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Services, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(Nicol, Jonathon)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Services, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Nicol, Jonathon)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Services, Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Nicol, Jonathon)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Harrison County, Missouri County, case number 17AH-CC00009, filed by Jonathon D Nicol on behalf of Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A., PHH Mortgage Services. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6762746. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Nicol, Jonathon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickey et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxann Rickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rickey, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. a/k/a The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Tillma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services
Represented By: Jonathon D Nicol
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathon D Nicol
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank,N.A.
Represented By: Jonathon D Nicol
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jonathon D Nicol
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novastar Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rez Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?