Stewart v. Precythe et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Stewart
Defendant: Stan Payne, Heather Haynes, Ronda Pash, (John) Doe, Anne L. Precythe and Jeannie Freelin
Case Number: 5:2020cv06055
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a response, on or before June 12, 2020, to Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Doc. #20 ), or face dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 05/15/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 SUGGESTIONS in support re #20 MOTION to dismiss party Heather Haynes and Jeannie Freelin filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendants Jeannie Freelin, Heather Haynes. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Blanton, Mark)
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss party Heather Haynes and Jeannie Freelin filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Jeannie Freelin, Heather Haynes. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blanton, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to order re #17 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Defendants Jeannie Freelin, Heather Haynes. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Blanton, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of appearance by Mark D. Blanton on behalf of Jeannie Freelin, Heather Haynes (Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Jeannie Freelin(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Blanton added to party Heather Haynes(pty:dft))(Blanton, Mark)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Defendants Precythe, Payne, John Doe Defendants, and Pash are severed and dismissed from this case; (2) the Attorney General of Missouri shall notify the Court, in writing, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, for which Defendants they will and will not waive service of process; and (3) Defendants Haynes and Freelin answer or otherwise respond, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and 12, within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order if service of process is waived, or within twenty-one (21) days after service of process if service of process is not waived. Signed on April 9, 2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01075.
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT to: Western District of Missouri: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. (Case to be transferred after 4/7/2020.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/24/2020. (AFC) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Tue Mar 24 10:03:46 CDT 2020 (Cordray, Abby) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, #2 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT)(JMP) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Stan Payne, Anne L. Precythe Amendment to #1 DCM Complaint, filed by Curtis Stewart. Related document: #1 DCM Complaint filed by Curtis Stewart.(JMP) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Curtis Stewarts Motion for Enlargement of Time to file an Amended Complaint (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have to and including Thursday, September 26, 2019 to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Courts July 26, 2019 order.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/26/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/27/2019. (AAS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Tue Aug 27 15:39:57 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER - FINANCIAL ENTRY Collection of Filing Fee. (AAS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECFNo. #2 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the institution having custody of plaintiff shall,whenever the amount in plaintiffs prison account exceeds $10.00, send monthly payments thatequal 20 percent of the funds credited to the account the preceding month to the United StatesDistrict Court for the Eastern District of Missouri Clerks office, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courtsprisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint withinthirty (30) days from the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Courtmay dismiss this action without further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (ECFNo. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Show Cause of Hinderance ofAccess to Courts (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED without prejudice. (cc: mailed plaintiff a copy of the Courtsprisoner civil rights complaint form.( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/25/2019.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/26/2019. (AAS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Fri Jul 26 15:04:17 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to Court from Curtis Stewart re:requesting a copy of the docket sheet (cc: Mr. Stewart a copy of the docket sheet) (AAS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE OF HINDRANCE OF ACCESS TO COURTS by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (AAS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 1, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed May 1 11:01:10 CDT 2019 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
May 1, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Curtis Stewart. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Stan Payne, Anne L. Precythe Jury Demand,, filed by Curtis Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope, #3 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Precythe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Haynes
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Pash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (John) Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Freelin
Represented By: Mark D. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?