Mathews v. Fieldworks, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Mathews
Defendant: Fieldworks, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06057
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Michael Mathews. (Watkins, Jayson)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Settlement Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. Signed on 5/20/2020 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Fieldworks, LLC.(Carpenter, Christopher)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/10/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/24/2020. Signed on April 10, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clinton County, Missouri County, case number 20CN-CC00024, Fieldworks, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6815203. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Carpenter, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews v. Fieldworks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mathews
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldworks, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?