Hitzelberger et al v. Nissan North America Inc.
Plaintiff: Beth Hitzelberger and Samuel Hitzelberger
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv06066
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 unopposed motion for extension of time. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/29/2020. Signed on 6/19/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (El-Zein, Anna)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to submit proposed scheduling order and to make initial disclosures filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kennedy, Court)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Certificate of Service (Doc 8) filed on 5/28/20 is GRANTED. That document will be withdrawn. Signed on 5/28/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to withdraw document Certificate of Service filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Beth Hitzelberger, Samuel Hitzelberger. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kennedy, Court)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 (THIS DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN - SEE ORDER, Doc. 10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beth Hitzelberger, Samuel Hitzelberger ROGGS and RFPD to Defendant filed by Court T Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiffs Beth Hitzelberger, Samuel Hitzelberger.(Kennedy, Court) Modified on 5/28/2020 (Cordell, Annette).
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Nissan North America Inc..(Suroff, Adam)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/19/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 6/5/2020. Signed on 5/5/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Proof of Service by Nissan North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Suroff, Adam)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Nissan North America Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Suroff, Adam)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Adam Tod Suroff on behalf of Defendant Nissan North America Inc..(Suroff, Adam)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Platte County, Missouri County, case number 20AE-CC00109, Nissan North America Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6840247. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Suroff, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitzelberger et al v. Nissan North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Hitzelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Hitzelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc.
Represented By: Adam Tod Suroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?